Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 208 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 1865 m/e 05/1946
BR 61865 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K309/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal During 06/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 35 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
39A Gorton 3w/e 31/05/1950
2F Woodford Halse w/e 09/04/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 14/05/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 01/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1932 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 208
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1932 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1865    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61865    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61865    

prev prev