Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 19010 Month
» 241411 Year
» 1125792 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 227 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 1866 m/e 04/1946
BR 61866 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal Thu 19/10/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 36 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 22/09/1956
40B Immingham 4w/e 08/01/1958
40A Lincoln w/e 24/12/1960
   Withdrawn 19/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   19/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 227
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1866    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61866    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
19/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61866    

prev prev