Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 117 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 117 Week
» 19012 Month
» 241413 Year
» 1125794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 231 m/e 12/1925
LNER (1946) 1869 m/e 24/03/1946
BR 61869 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1925
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1925
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 37 yrs , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/10/1956
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/01/1960
   Withdrawn 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 5w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 02/09/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1931 Long Travel Valves fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 231
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1931 Modification Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1869    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61869    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61869    

prev prev