Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 145 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4386 Week
» 17419 Month
» 239820 Year
» 1124201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1300 m/e 04/1929
LNER (1946) 1870 m/e 03/1946
BR 61870 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K304/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 315
Works Number 1711
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1929
Withdrawal Thu 12/07/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WFD Woodford Halse 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GOR Gorton m/e 07/1949
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn 12/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 02/07/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   12/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1932 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1300
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1711
   
03/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1870    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61870    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61870    

prev prev