Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1331 m/e 06/1929
LNER (1946) 1873 m/e 24/03/1946
BR 61873 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K306/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 315
Works Number 1714
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1929
Withdrawal Tue 08/05/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn 08/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC MAR March 16/02/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   08/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1931 Steam Brake fitted
10/1931 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1331
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1714
   
10/1931 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
10/1931 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1873    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61873    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61873    

prev prev