Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 335 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19246 Week
» 84200 Month
» 286864 Year
» 3313717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1364 |
m/e |
07/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1875 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61875 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
315 |
Works Number |
1716 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/12/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
23/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1931 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1931 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1364 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1716 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1875 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61875 |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
10/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61875 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|