Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 19010 Month
» 241411 Year
» 1125792 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1364 m/e 07/1929
LNER (1946) 1875 m/e 08/1946
BR 61875 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K307/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 315
Works Number 1716
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1929
Withdrawal Mon 10/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/01/1960
   Withdrawn 10/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   10/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1931 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1931 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1364
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1716
   
11/1931 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1931 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1875    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61875    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
10/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61875    

prev prev