Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 903 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1803 Week
» 13624 Month
» 182396 Year
» 1066777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1367 m/e 08/1929
LNER (1946) 1877 m/e 05/1946
BR 61877 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 315
Works Number 1718
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1929
Withdrawal Tue 24/07/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/03/1951
31B March 4w/e 19/05/1951
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 20/10/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/01/1952
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 13/02/1960
40A Lincoln w/e 26/03/1960
40B Immingham w/e 06/08/1960
40E Colwick w/e 04/11/1961
   Withdrawn 24/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 29/01/1949
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 26/06/1949
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 31B March w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 40B Immingham 5w/e 06/08/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   24/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1933 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1933 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1367
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1718
   
04/1933 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1933 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1877    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61877    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
24/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61877    

prev prev