|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1368 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1719 |
||
02/1932 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
02/1932 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1878 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61878 | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
06/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61878 | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |