Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 117 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 117 Week
» 19012 Month
» 241413 Year
» 1125794 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1368 m/e 08/1929
LNER (1946) 1878 m/e 05/1946
BR 61878 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 315
Works Number 1719
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1929
Withdrawal Thu 06/08/1959
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 30 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 06/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 19/02/1949
WDN   06/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1932 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1368
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1719
   
02/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
02/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1878    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61878    
06/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61878    

prev prev