Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 346 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1271 Week
» 18607 Month
» 296403 Year
» 1180784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1387 m/e 10/1929
LNER (1946) 1880 m/e 11/1946
BR 61880 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1721
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1929
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 20/12/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
31B March w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1932 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1387
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1721
   
03/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1880    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61880    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61880    

prev prev