Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 279 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2186 Week
» 20968 Month
» 269261 Year
» 1153642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1388 m/e 10/1929
LNER (1946) 1881 m/e 11/1946
BR 61881 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1722
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1929
Withdrawal Thu 21/04/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 21/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 19/02/1949
WDN   21/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1932 Steam Brake fitted
04/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1388
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1722
   
04/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1881    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61881    
21/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61881    

prev prev