Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3582 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16988 Week
» 70004 Month
» 189531 Year
» 3216384 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1389 |
m/e |
10/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1882 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61882 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
316 |
Works Number |
1723 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 10/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/05/1960 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1929 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2F |
|
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/05/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
5w/e |
02/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1932 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
02/1932 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1389 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1723 |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1882 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61882 |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61882 |
|
|