Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1389 m/e 10/1929
LNER (1946) 1882 m/e 10/1946
BR 61882 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K310/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1723
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1929
Withdrawal Sat 28/05/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2F Woodford Halse w/e 11/04/1959
   Withdrawn 28/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 02/05/1959
WDN   w/e 28/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1932 Steam Brake fitted
02/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1389
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1723
   
02/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
02/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1882    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61882    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
28/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61882    

prev prev