Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1449 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19252 Week
» 72268 Month
» 191795 Year
» 3218648 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1391 |
m/e |
10/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1883 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61883 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
316 |
Works Number |
1724 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 10/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/12/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1929 |
HLD |
|
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1931 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1931 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. |
SLS/194903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1391 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1724 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1883 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61883 |
|
|
03/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61883 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|