Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1392 m/e 11/1929
LNER (1946) 1884 m/e 10/1946
BR 61884 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1725
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1929
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/07/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 16/05/1953
52B Heaton 4w/e 11/10/1958
52H Tyne Dock w/e 10/12/1960
52B Heaton w/e 31/12/1960
52H Tyne Dock w/e 21/01/1961
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 05/08/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 23/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 16/10/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 12/08/1961
WDN   w/e 23/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1931 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1931 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1392
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1725
   
11/1931 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1931 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1884    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61884    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
21/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
23/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61884    

prev prev