Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 431 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5625 Week
» 12676 Month
» 235077 Year
» 1119458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1397 m/e 12/1929
LNER (1946) 1888 m/e 10/1946
BR 61888 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1729
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1929
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 31 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 23/03/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1932 Steam Brake fitted
03/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1397
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1729
   
03/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
03/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1888    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61888    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61888    

prev prev