Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 979 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6577 Week
» 29083 Month
» 332273 Year
» 1553838 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1398 m/e 12/1929
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1889 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 61889 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1730
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1929
Withdrawal Sun 04/11/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1929
MAR March on 01/01/1948
40A Lincoln 4w/e 25/09/1954
40E Colwick w/e 22/10/1960
40B Immingham w/e 20/01/1962
   Withdrawn on 04/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March on 23/03/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/10/1948
ALLOC MAR March 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC MAR March w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   on 04/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted
05/1932 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1954 York Area New BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0s 73053/54 (20A) joined 73045 at the end of June on the Holbeck working to York and Scarborough., During the Bank Holiday period. Horwich Moguls 42795/98 (20A) were also used on this turn, but it was worked on Saturday 7/8/54 by Jubilee 45605 (20A). Standard Diesel shunter 13127 from Darlington Works arrived at York on 21/7/54 hauled by Diesel 12115, which was returning from Darlington Works to Hull. 13127 proceeded to New England later in the day.
The Class Y8 shed pilot at York (formerly 8091) has been renumbered Departmental 55. Class B17 61660 (30A) was working on passenger trains between York and Doncaster from 22/7/54 until 24/7/54. York-Scarborough line LMR Stanier Class 5 4-6-0s working on through duties to Scarborough in July and August have included 44660 (21A), 44830 (19B), 44928 (25A), 44986 (19B), 45237 (25B)-on an excursion from Burton-on-Trent-45259 (10C), 45261 (25A), and 45336 (26A); also Standard 4-6-0 73016 (19B).
Class 4F 0-4-0 43963 (21A) also worked through from King's Norton to Scarborough on 24/7/54. K3 61889 (31B) worked the up Scarborough Flyer between Scarborough and York on 7/8/54 and on the same day 61947 (31B) worked the 4.45 p:m. from York to Scarborough. On 24/7/54 the 2.12 p.m. from Scarborough to Kings Cross was worked to York by K3 61980 (38B). An unusual B1 at Scarborough on 25/7/54 was 61331 (34A) on an excursion from Penistone.
SLS/195410
04/01/1959 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. SLS/195902
19/03/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1929 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1398
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1730
   
05/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
05/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1889    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61889    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
20/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61889    

prev prev