Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1398 m/e 12/1929
LNER (1946) 1889 m/e 07/1946
BR 61889 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K312/1929
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 316
Works Number 1730
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1929
Withdrawal Sun 04/11/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 4w/e 25/09/1954
40E Colwick w/e 22/10/1960
40B Immingham w/e 20/01/1962
   Withdrawn 04/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March 23/03/1947
ALLOC MAR March 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC MAR March w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   04/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted
05/1932 Steam Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1929 To Service To service as LNER Number 1398
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1730
   
05/1932 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
05/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1889    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61889    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
20/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61889    
1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev