Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 906 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 13627 Month
» 182399 Year
» 1066780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2761 m/e 07/1930
LNER (1946) 1890 m/e 09/1946
BR 61890 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K307/1930
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1930
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2761
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1890    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61890    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61890    

prev prev