Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16522 Week
» 69538 Month
» 189065 Year
» 3215918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2762 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1891 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61891 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1496 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 12/09/1961 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1930 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40A |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2762 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1496 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1891 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61891 |
|
|
1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
12/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61891 |
|
|