Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2764 m/e 07/1930
LNER (1946) 1893 m/e 10/1946
BR 61893 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K307/1930
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1930
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
   Withdrawn 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 02/09/1951
WDN   17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2764
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1893    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61893    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61893    

prev prev