Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 835 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 835 Week
» 21817 Month
» 163771 Year
» 1048152 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2766 m/e 07/1930
LNER (1946) 1895 m/e 09/1946
BR 61895 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K307/1930
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1930
Withdrawal Wed 18/07/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 32 yrs , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn 18/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   18/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2766
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1895    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61895    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61895    

prev prev