Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2767 m/e 08/1930
LNER (1946) 1896 m/e 11/1946
BR 61896 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1930
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1930
Withdrawal Mon 14/05/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn 14/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   14/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2767
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1896    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61896    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61896    

prev prev