Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 3 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2864 Week
» 21646 Month
» 269939 Year
» 1154320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2768 m/e 08/1930
LNER (1946) 1897 m/e 10/1946
BR 61897 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1930
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1930
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 32 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2768
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1897    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61897    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61897    

prev prev