Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 832 Week
» 21814 Month
» 163768 Year
» 1048149 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1100 m/e 03/1931
LNER (1946) 1899 m/e 27/01/1946
BR 61899 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K303/1931
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L86
Works Number 1111
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1931
Withdrawal Tue 18/12/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 31 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 13/12/1952
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 17/09/1955
   Withdrawn 18/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 10/09/1955
WDN   18/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 1100
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1111
   
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1899    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61899    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
17/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
18/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61899    

prev prev