Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14300 Week
» 67316 Month
» 186843 Year
» 3213696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1135 |
m/e |
04/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1910 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
61910 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
L86 |
Works Number |
1122 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 04/1931 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/07/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1947 |
Queens Park Works |
During March five new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1134-1138. Nos. 1134 , 1135 , 1136 , 1137 , 1138 . No. 1139 (the last of the present batch) appeared on 1/4. Works' Nos. checked are: 1134/5 (25890/91 of 1946), 1138/9 (25894/95 of 1946). |
SLS/194705 |
03/06/1954 |
Northwich MPD |
The afternoon freight from Crewe, via Middlewich was worked by No. 73008 of 84K. Longsight's Class 2P, No. 40506 was on the sheerlegs siding, sandwiched between a couple of J10 goods. Inside the shed, 62656 'Sir Clement Royds' had just received a good clean, and was the only D10 present. A Mottram-Bidston freight was headed by No. 61910. |
SLS/195408 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1135 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1122 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1910 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61910 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61910 |
|
|