Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1158 m/e 05/1931
LNER (1946) 1915 m/e 10/02/1946
BR 61915 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K305/1931
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L86
Works Number 1127
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1931
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/03/1952
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 1158
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1127
   
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1915    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61915    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61915    

prev prev