Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1162 m/e 05/1931
LNER (1946) 1916 m/e 27/01/1946
BR 61916 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K305/1931
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L86
Works Number 1128
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12B Carlisle Canal 4w/e 11/08/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Canal 4w/e 14/07/1951
WDN   w/e 31/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 1162
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1128
   
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1916    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61916    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B)    
12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61916    

prev prev