Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 688 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9027 Week
» 6135 Month
» 113081 Year
» 1334646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2935 m/e 09/1934
LNER (1946) 1926 m/e 01/1947
BR 61926 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K309/1934
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L88
Works Number 1163
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 09/1934
Withdrawal Tue 10/04/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LOW Lowestoft 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 21/11/1959
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 27/02/1960
40A Lincoln w/e 26/03/1960
   Withdrawn 10/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/03/1960
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   10/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1934 To Service To service as LNER Number 2935
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1163
   
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1926    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61926    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
10/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61926    

prev prev