Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2936 m/e 01/1935
LNER (1946) 1927 m/e 11/1946
BR 61927 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1935
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L88
Works Number 1164
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1935
Withdrawal Mon 17/07/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 20/09/1952
50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/01/1960
   Withdrawn 17/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   17/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2936
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1164
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1927    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61927    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
17/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61927    

prev prev