Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 258 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 4499 Week
» 21448 Month
» 135709 Year
» 1020090 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2937 m/e 01/1935
LNER (1946) 1928 m/e 10/1946
BR 61928 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K301/1935
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L88
Works Number 1165
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 01/1935
Withdrawal Fri 05/02/1960
Scrapping During y/e 1960
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 05/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 19/02/1949
WDN   05/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2937
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1165
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1928    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61928    
05/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61928    

prev prev