Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3524 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16930 Week
» 69946 Month
» 189473 Year
» 3216326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2937 |
m/e |
01/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1928 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61928 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
L88 |
Works Number |
1165 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 05/02/1960 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1935 |
GHD |
|
Gateshead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
HTN |
|
Heaton |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/02/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
STM |
St Margarets |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2937 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1165 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1928 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61928 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61928 |
|
|