Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3874 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22785 Week
» 87739 Month
» 290403 Year
» 3317256 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2939 |
m/e |
01/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1937 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61937 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E152 |
Works Number |
4083 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/03/1960 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2939 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4083 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1937 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61937 |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61937 |
|
|