Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2940 |
m/e |
01/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1938 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
61938 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E152 |
Works Number |
4084 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/12/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2940 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4084 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1938 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61938 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
29/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61938 |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|