Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 825 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3385 Week
» 16418 Month
» 238819 Year
» 1123200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2426 m/e 08/1935
LNER (1946) 1940 m/e 08/1946
BR 61940 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K308/1935
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L890
Works Number 24226
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 08/1935
Withdrawal Fri 04/05/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn 04/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   04/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2426
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24226
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1940    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61940    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
04/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61940    

prev prev