Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18139 Week
» 71155 Month
» 190682 Year
» 3217535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2442 |
m/e |
09/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
61946 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L890 |
Works Number |
24232 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/06/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1935 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
MAR |
|
March |
5w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/06/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAR |
March |
5w/e |
26/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2442 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24232 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1946 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61946 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61946 |
|
|