|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2448 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24235 |
||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1949 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61949 | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
10/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
17/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
23/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61949 |