Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2448 m/e 09/1935
LNER (1946) 1949 m/e 17/03/1946
BR 61949 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K309/1935
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L890
Works Number 24235
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 09/1935
Withdrawal Tue 10/04/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LOW Lowestoft 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/01/1959
40A Lincoln w/e 10/12/1960
40E Colwick w/e 17/12/1960
36A Doncaster w/e 23/09/1961
   Withdrawn 10/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   10/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2448
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24235
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1949    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61949    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
10/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61949    

prev prev