Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14258 Week
» 67274 Month
» 186801 Year
» 3213654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2466 |
m/e |
10/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1956 |
on |
17/02/1946 |
British Railways |
61956 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L890 |
Works Number |
24242 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GOR |
Gorton |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1959 |
Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) |
On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2466 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24242 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
17/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1956 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61956 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61956 |
|
|