Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17004 Week
» 70020 Month
» 189547 Year
» 3216400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2467 |
m/e |
11/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1957 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61957 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L890 |
Works Number |
24243 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2467 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24243 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1957 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61957 |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61957 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|