Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2446 |
m/e |
05/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1962 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61962 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
L92 |
Works Number |
1273 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 19/12/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2446 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1273 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1962 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61962 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
19/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61962 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|