Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2453 m/e 06/1936
LNER (1946) 1963 m/e 08/1946
BR 61963 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K306/1936
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number L92
Works Number 1274
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 06/1936
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1963
Service Life 26 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
40A Lincoln 4w/e 19/07/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 18/10/1952
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 20/12/1958
31B March w/e 18/06/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 31B March 3w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2453
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1274
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1963    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61963    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61963    

prev prev