Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 575 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14618 Week
» 79572 Month
» 282236 Year
» 3309089 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2470 |
m/e |
10/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1969 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61969 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1678 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
6w/e |
11/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2470 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1678 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1969 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61969 |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61969 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|