Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19076 Week
» 84030 Month
» 286694 Year
» 3313547 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2499 |
m/e |
10/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1972 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61972 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1681 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1936 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
5w/e |
04/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
02/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/08/1951 |
Unusual K.X. arrivals |
On 7/8/51 the 12.53 p.m. arrival (ex Hull) reached King's Cross at 2.8 behind B1 's 61331 an 61094, followed at 2.20 by the Newcastle due at 1.31. This was hauled by 61972 of 35A. The 1.41 and 1.51 Newcastle and Sunderland trains, the 2.2 Leeds and 2.12 T.T. Pullman then followed at intervals as circumstances permitted. The next day the 1.30 p.m. arrival ex Newcastle was booked 1 hr. 40 mins. late at 2.15 and the Grantham crew who work this turn would have to step lively to get to the end of No. 10 platform by 3.30 p.m., their booked return working. When this occurred on another recent occasion, they arrived after 3.20 and went straight round to No. 10 just in time to take over from the relief King's Cross crew who were preparing to take the train out. A day or two before the holiday, the T.T. Pullman, running very late, arrived at K.X. about 5 p.m. behind 60076 (still green). The turn round was made very slickly and the train left again within 25 mins. The 'Capitals' has run very well lately and Haymarket have kept 60027 going for an unbroken spell of two weeks. On the K.X. end 60022 has performed very well, and is now being rested while 60029 takes her turn. On Saturday 4/8/51 the 8.8 p.m. arrival from Peterboro' passed Potters Bar at 7.50 behind 43080 (35A), believed to be the first recorded visit of one of these on a passenger train in the London area. |
SLS/195110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2499 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1681 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1972 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61972 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61972 |
|
|