Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3815 m/e 11/1936
LNER (1946) 1975 m/e 07/1946
BR 61975 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1936
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal Mon 04/09/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 24 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
38A Colwick 4w/e 22/09/1956
38B Annesley 4w/e 15/12/1956
56B Ardsley w/e 16/05/1959
56F Low Moor w/e 17/06/1961
   Withdrawn 04/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 38B Annesley 3w/e 01/12/1956
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
LOAN 56B Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 91NE   4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   04/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 3815
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1975    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61975    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
04/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61975    

prev prev