Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3816 m/e 11/1936
LNER (1946) 1976 m/e 09/1946
BR 61976 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1936
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal Thu 04/01/1962
Scrapping During y/e 1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 02/04/1960
41J Langwith Junction w/e 24/06/1961
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 04/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   04/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 3816
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1976    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61976    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
04/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61976    

prev prev