Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 376 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6160 Week
» 27549 Month
» 147076 Year
» 3173929 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3816 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1976 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61976 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1685 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 04/01/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3816 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1685 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1976 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61976 |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61976 |
|
|