Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 541 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18344 Week
» 71360 Month
» 190887 Year
» 3217740 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3818 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1978 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
61978 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1687 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/08/1961 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1936 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
17/11/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/08/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1959 |
Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) |
On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3818 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1687 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1978 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61978 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61978 |
|
|