Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3818 m/e 11/1936
LNER (1946) 1978 m/e 07/1946
BR 61978 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class K3
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
K311/1936
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service During 11/1936
Withdrawal Thu 17/08/1961
Scrapping During y/e 1961
Service Life 24 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35A New England 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 17/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   17/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 3818
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1978    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61978    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
17/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61978    

prev prev